THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:30:19 AM
Charania, Diamondali Kassamali
CPSO#:
27565
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of East Africa, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
725 Krosno Blvd
Pickering ON L1W 1G4
Phone: 905-839-3353
Fax: 905-839-3391
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIAMONDALI KASSAMALI CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1975 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Nov 1983
Summary:
In November 1983, Dr. Charania pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice, and as defined in s. 26(14) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he had charged a fee for services not performed. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Charania guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Charania's licence to practice medicine in Ontario be suspended for three months, and recommended that his name be published in the Reports of the College.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 14 Nov 1983
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 24, 2020, Dr. Diamondali Kassamali Charania has completed all components of his SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 24, 2020, Dr. Diamondali Kassamali Charania has completed all components of his SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)