THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:33:19 PM
Woolf, Stephen Maurice
CPSO#:
27194
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Nov 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Dec 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1981 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Oct 2006 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 12, 2006
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from October 12, 2006, Dr. Stephen Maurice Woolf undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:
1. I, Stephen Maurice Woolf, hereby resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
2. I promise not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.
3. I consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.
4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has agreed to withdraw the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence that are currently pending before the Discipline Committee.
5. I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.