THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:59:53 PM
Swinson, Richard Price
CPSO#:
27001
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Sep 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:ATTN: Tiffany Johnston
Anxiety Treatment and Research Clinic
Sr. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street, Level 1, Block B
Hamilton, ON L8N 3K7
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext 34964
Fax: 905-521-6120
Date Received: 14 Dec 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |