THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 2:05:37 AM
Bethell, Walter Hiltz
CPSO#:
26942
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records for former patients of Dr. Walter H. Bethell's practise have been transferred to Dr. Bonnie Weston (#58303). All requests of this nature should be directed to Dr. Bonnie Weston (#58303).
Date Received: 25 Feb 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:25 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |