THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:00:35 PM
Kobetz, Lawrence Elliot
CPSO#:
26745
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Apr 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2757 King St E
Hamilton ON L8G 5E4
Phone: 905 870 7034
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L. Kobetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Safe Stor Records Management
2704 Highway 20
Fonthill ON L0S 1E6
Tel: 905-892-0010
Tel 2: 905-380-8616
Fax: 905-892-9465
Date Received: 26 Sep 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ELLIOT KOBETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBETZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2021 |