THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:01:05 AM
Slyfield, David Gore Mccrumine
CPSO#:
26724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
107-2737 Keele St
Humber River Medical Centre
North York ON M3M 2E9
Phone: 416-630-4089
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Records Management Ltd: 1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 29 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID GORE MCCRUMINE SLYFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLYFIELD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)