THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:43:19 PM
Gysler, Mathias
CPSO#:
26669
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
25 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Jan-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mathias Gysler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:13 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 25 Jan 2018 |