THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:58:48 PM
Awde, Murray Gordon
CPSO#:
26494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
1261 Beaverbrook Rd
London ON N6H 0G6
Phone: (519) 472-0454
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Murray Awde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MURRAY GORDON AWDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWDE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1974 |