THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:58:25 PM
De Alwis, Watutantrige Assajee
CPSO#:
26396
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
10 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Apr 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact:
Dr. Michael Murray
72 Brant Avenue
Brantford, ON
N3T 5Z8
Tel: (519) 756-4310
Date Received: 30 Mar 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jun 2009 |