THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:14:22 AM
MacDonald, Angus Laurie
CPSO#:
26012
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:04 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1969 to 14 Jun 1970
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Feb 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |