THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:30:57 PM
Kuch, Klaus
CPSO#:
26005
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Aug 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2005 |