THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:59:02 AM
Marsden, Robert Jay
CPSO#:
25794
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Marsden, Bob (used until: 04 Jan 2023 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237781 Inglis Falls Road RR 4
Owen Sound ON N4K 5N6
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Mar 2023 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAY MARSDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSDEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 May 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2023 |