THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 0:29:34 AM
Rennie, John Mark
CPSO#:
25711
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 May 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 22, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. John Mark Rennie to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. John Mark Rennie:
1.).Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
2).Undertake not to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
3).Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
4).Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated June 10, 2004 and September 2, 2009 regarding sexual abuse, sexual impropriety, disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and incompetence.
6).Agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated June 10, 2004 and September 2, 2009.