Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Mar 2006
Summary:
On March 24, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he had engaged in conduct or an act relavant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, in that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration by prescribing drugs with a controlled drug content to a patient in contravention of a Discipline Committee order prohibiting him from doing so.
The Discipline Committee directed and ordered that:
1. Dr. Skocylak's certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 4 months commencing on April 17, 2006.
2. Dr. Skocylak be subject to quarterly random chart reviews for 2 years at his own expense, by a member of the College, approved by the Registrar.
3. The previously ordered terms, conditions and limitation imposed by the Discipline Committee on January 10, 2005 will remain in effect as follows:
i. Dr. Skocylak(s privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be suspended; and
ii. Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office advising his patients of his suspension in privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 24, 2006
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jan 2005
Summary:
On January 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice by failing to honour an undertaking given to the College to surrender his privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.
As well, Dr. Skocylak mailed post-dated prescriptions to a patient for medication with either a narcotic or a controlled drug content.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:
1) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, four (4) months of which shall be suspended upon Dr. Skocylak s successful completion of the College s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course by no later than April 14, 2005 and the College s Physicians Prescribing Skills course by no later than April 14, 2005.
2) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to commence the suspension of Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration on February 14, 2005.
3) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:
a) that Dr. Skocylak s privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be suspended;
b) that Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office(s) advising his patients of his suspension in privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs; and
c) that in the event that Dr. Skocylak fails to comply with any of the terms of this Order, his certificate of registration shall be immediately suspended for the remainder of the six (6) month period.
4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 10, 2005