THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:51:26 AM
Faulkner, John Roger
CPSO#:
25589
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
09 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
9-Feb-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J.R. Faulkner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Files have been stored as per above.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services
111 Regis Cres S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-342-1052
Date Received: 05 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1973 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 18 May 2001 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 18 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 09 Feb 2018 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Apr 2001
Summary:
On April 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Faulkner(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct with regard to the following:
Failing to fulfil terms of an agreement for professional services;
Failure without reasonable cause to provide a report or certificate relating to an examination or treatment performed by the member to his patient or his authorized agent;
Failure to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College;
Engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Committee directed the following penalty:
Recorded reprimand;
Costs awarded to the College in the amount of $6,500 to be paid within 30 days;
One-month suspension to commence no later than May 31, 2001;
Peer assessment of office practice and office inspection to be conducted within one year at Dr. Faulkner(s expense with the results to be reported to the Registrar who is directed to take appropriate action if the results are unsatisfactory.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 26, 2001