THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 9:28:20 AM
Vanek, Irene
CPSO#:
25210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, German
Education: J.E. Purkyne University, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
3rd Floor
Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 5945
Fax: (416) 864-5953
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:14 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRENE VANEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANEK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 08 Jul 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 1975 |