THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:33:59 AM
YADAV, MAHESH Prasad
CPSO#:
24861
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu
Education: Nagpur University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yadav Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |