THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:19:59 AM
Malcolm, Barry William
CPSO#:
24788
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Barry W. Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Orthopaedic Outpaitent Clinic
M Gorund Access through Cathy Breutigam
(416-480-6775 or [email protected])
or
RSRS: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 17 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2019 |