THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:12:22 PM
Swan, James Henry
CPSO#:
24589
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
04 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
4-Jun-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Mar 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 04 Jun 2021 |