THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:21:18 AM
Spence, John David
CPSO#:
24484
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Spence Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 16 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:24 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2023 |