THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:05:09 PM
Griffiths, Frances Anne Harrington
CPSO#:
24266
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Apr 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Harrington Griffiths, Frances Anne (used until: 18 Mar 2003 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2006 |