THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:01:07 PM
Balsys, Aras Jonas
CPSO#:
24016
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Lithuanian
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Aras Balsys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
North Park Clinic
D2 - 2355 Keele St
Toronto, ON M6M 4A2
OR
Steeles Midland Medical Centre
4779 Steeles Ave. E.
Toronto, ON M9V 4S5
OR
Toronto Chronic Diseases Centre
210 - 2330 Kennedy Rd.
Scarborough, ON M1T 0A2
Date Received: 08 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Dec 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 26 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 24 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 13 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Please see February 13, 2017, undertaking attached.
Download Full Document (PDF)