THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:59:58 AM
Kuntz, Michael Philip
CPSO#:
23816
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
12 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Sep-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael Kuntz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 28 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may contact the address above.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc
111 St Regis Cres S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
TEL# (416) 398-0638
FAX# (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 19 Mar 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 12 Sep 2018 |