THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:23:20 PM
Khambhla, Arvind Dharamshi
CPSO#:
23781
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Gujarat University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Arvind D. Khambhla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 28 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:: Patients who are seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Management Ltd. at 1 800-775-0093
Date Received: 16 Dec 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:02 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |