THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:41:14 AM
Shepherd, James Victor
CPSO#:
23526
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hawthorne Medical Clinic
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON N2Z 3C1
Tel: (519) 396-6749
Date Received: 30 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Nov 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |