THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:36:07 PM
Weston, William Fenton Douglas
CPSO#:
23462
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Mar 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: W.F.D. Weston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Martins Peoples Storage, 42 Terry Fox Drive, Kingston, ON, K7M 8N5, (613)-545-1365
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 1969 |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |