THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:35:56 PM
Masood, Khaja Mohammed
CPSO#:
23440
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
6-Jan-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Osmania University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Khaja Masood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Khaja Mohammed Masood to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 14, 2017:
Dr. Masood's sleep medicine practice was assessed by the College and, as a result, Dr. Masood must not practise or engage in sleep medicine at this time.
Dr. Masood shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Masood must not practice or engage in sleep medicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".