THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:54:19 AM
O'Mahony, Michael Fergus John
CPSO#:
23404
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Michael O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 12 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2022 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 27, 2016 at the Ontario Superior Court in London, Ontario, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Michael O'Mahony in respect of an incident that took place in August 2007.