THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:26:54 PM
Sanchez, Adolfo
CPSO#:
23287
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Nov 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
15-Mar-2024
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: University of Valladolid, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Call toll free at: 1-800-775-0093 or visit www.recordsregistry.ca for paitent medical charts
Date Received: 28 Aug 2018
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 13 Aug 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2018 |