THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:35:29 PM
Maier, Gary Joseph Peter
CPSO#:
22949
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Aug 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Aug 1985 |