THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:48:38 PM
Cooke, Theodore Derek Vernon
CPSO#:
21945
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Derek Cooke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
271 Mica Point Rd
R R 3
Maberly, Ontario
K0H 2B0
Canada
Date Received: 22 Jun 2020
Instructions/Address:Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to: [email protected] or via mail to:
RR# 3
271 Mica Point Rd
Maberly, ON K0H 2B0
or contact Dr.Cooke via
613 - 279 - 1217
Date Received: 31 Jul 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |