THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:50:22 AM
McHattie, James David
CPSO#:
21405
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jun 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:01 Jan 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2015 |