THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:16:09 AM
Sky, Kenneth
CPSO#:
21311
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 May 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
1315 Finch Ave W
Suite 403
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 2G6
4515 Ebenezer
Unit 114
Brampton, Ontario
L6P 0B7
1525 Albion Rd # 100
Etobicoke, Ontario
M9V 5G5
Date Received: 31 May 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 18, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 5, 2009, William Osler Heatlh Centre notified the College that Dr. Kenneth Sky's privileges will be suspended from November 18, 2009 to December 17, 2009.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2020 |