THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:27:03 AM
Bannatyne, Robert Mccay
CPSO#:
20950
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Sep 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 302
780 Gordon Street
Thunder Bay, ON P7E 6S1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:16 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2015 |