THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:03:48 AM
Logan, Alexander Gordon
CPSO#:
20943
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Apr 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Balmoral Ave
Toronto ON M4V 3B9
Phone: 14164182772
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER GORDON LOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Aug 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1974 |