THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:27:00 PM
Vanderlinden, Richard Graham
CPSO#:
20917
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:11823B Loyalist Pkwy
R R 4
Picton, Ontario
K0K 2T0
Date Received: 12 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1966 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2020 |