THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:49:44 AM
Ambis, Robert Joseph Stanley
CPSO#:
20902
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jul 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Ambis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:310-15 Mountain Ave. South
Stoney Creek, Ontario L8G 2V6
Date Received: 22 Apr 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 4, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Joseph Stanley Ambis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2020:
The College investigated Dr. Ambis’s conduct in his family medicine practice. During the investigation, Dr. Ambis resigned his certificate of registration from the College, which he obtained in 1967. Dr. Ambis will not reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. The College made no findings against Dr. Ambis and took no further action on its investigation.
Download Full Document (PDF)