THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 6:32:05 AM
Tilly, William Arthur
CPSO#:
20862
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Nov 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2000 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2000 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2001 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2001 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 27 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Feb 2001
Summary:
On February 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tilly(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
The Committee directed:
1. a recorded reprimand;
2. six months suspension effective March 26, 2001;
3. three months of the suspension to be suspended subject to meeting with the terms of his undertaking dated February 7, 2001 as follows:
(a) to participate and fully cooperate in the Physician Review Program (PREP), including abiding by any recommendations by PREP or the Physician Enhancement Department of the College
(b) to pay the enrolment fee in PREP in the sum of $3,700
(c) to complete the College(s Medical Record Keeping Course for Physicians on or before October 2001; and,
(d) to fully cooperate with the College in a practice assessment approximately one year after the completion of PREP, all such costs to be borne by the College.
4. That any breach of the terms of the undertaking will result in the Registrar directing that Dr. Tilly(s certificate of registration be immediately suspended for the remaining three months of the suspension period ordered by the Discipline Committee;
5. That the Registrar immediately impose a term, condition and limitation upon the certificate of registration of Dr. Tilly that he not be permitted in his practice to prescribe, possess or purchase narcotics, controlled drugs or benzodiazepines; and,
6. That Dr. Tilly forthwith pay the costs of this hearing fixed in the sum of $1,000.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 26, 2001