THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:47:09 AM
Minc, Paul Humphrey
CPSO#:
20663
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
30 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Mar 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
30-Jun-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of London, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1971 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 1967 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 30 Jun 2020 |