THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:36:38 PM
Drake, Robert Michael
CPSO#:
20507
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
16 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
16-Oct-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For copies of medical records please contact Honey Alzner at 519-819-1000.
Date Received: 18 Oct 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1973 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1966 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 16 Oct 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Michael Drake to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2017:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Drake’s recordkeeping in his work as a psychotherapist. Dr. Drake has ceased to practice as a psychotherapist and has limited his practice to coroner work. Dr. Drake will not treat any patients in any capacity or prescribe any medication to any person.