THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:20:10 PM
Bradford, John Gwythar
CPSO#:
19787
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
13 May 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jan 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 1966 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 13 May 1997 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Aug 1995
Summary:
In August 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bradford guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, and in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Bradford's licence to practice be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-05-12
Hearing Date(s): Feb 20, 1995