THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:27:37 PM
North, Robert Harold
CPSO#:
19708
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
15 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Sep 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
15-Aug-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert H. North Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact Records Management Ltd by phone at 1-800-775-0093 or by fax at 647-933-2904.
Date Received: 23 Aug 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1965 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 15 Aug 2018 |