THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:24:39 PM
Hall, Robert Thomas
CPSO#:
19425
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Dec 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:02 Dec 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2004 |