THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:13:46 AM
Dziurdzy, Stanley Andrew
CPSO#:
19329
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
20 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Apr 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Aug-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 12 Aug 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1964 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 18 Feb 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1971 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 20 Aug 2018 |