THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:51:09 AM
Dotten, Dale Allan
CPSO#:
19327
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
04 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
4-May-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Aug 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 04 May 2023 |