THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:37:28 PM
Bull, Maurice Henry
CPSO#:
18578
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
13 Feb 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jan 1963
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1963 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 13 Feb 2001 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Feb 2001
Summary:
On February 13, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bull guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts of sexual impropriety; in that he sexually abused a patient; and, that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.
The Committee ordered that Dr. Bull be reprimanded and the reprimand be recorded on the register. As well, the Committee ordered his certificate of registration be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 13, 2001