THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:44:58 AM
Tucker, Eric Clinton
CPSO#:
18536
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Mar 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 1962 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 21 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1982 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2000 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 19 Mar 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2007 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Oct 2000
Summary:
On October 18, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tucker(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct, in that he had been found guilty of an offence, in relation to his prescribing of controlled substances, that is relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. In addition, he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, in that he resigned membership from the California Medical Board in the face of allegations relating to his prescribing of controlled substances.
The Discipline Committee ordered a recorded reprimand, and a six-month suspension, three months of which will be suspended if he gives up most of his narcotic prescribing privileges (he will be permitted to prescribe small dosages of codeine).
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 18, 2000
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 6, 2007
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
1. I, Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker, hereby resign from the College effective July 6, 2007 at 5:00 p.m.
2. I hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration to practise medicine in Ontario.
4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations that I am incompetent and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, on the basis of an expert report and a Physician Review and Enhancement Program ("PREP"), the College has in its possession. The expert report concluded that I failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment. The PREP report assessed me as functioning at the lowest level: Level 5-Critical Deficiency-Immediate Risk to Patient Safety.
7. I acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable.