THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:49:30 AM
Jeun, Bing Wann
CPSO#:
18114
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
18 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Nov 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please direct any inquiries regarding requests for medical records to:
P.O Box 32008
7980 Menard Street
Windsor ON N8S 4T8
Date Received: 30 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 1961 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2013 |