THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 20:37:13 PM
Epstein, Norman
CPSO#:
16514
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Dec 1957
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
15-Dec-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place
Unit 13
North York, ON M9L 0A3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 02 Nov 2020
Instructions/Address:
Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 27 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 1957 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Dec 1957 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |