THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:13:15 PM
Zerny, Cedric John
CPSO#:
15873
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Feb 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1943
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1955 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1956 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Feb 1988 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jan 1987
Summary:
In January 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Zerny guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Zerny's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months. It was also ordered that a restriction be placed on the Doctor's licence such that he be prohibited from practicing at any hospital, such restriction to take effect on the date of commencement of the suspension. The Committee ruled that should this Order become final on or before the first day of March, 1987, then the final two months of the period of suspension would themselves be suspended.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Jan 1987